« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2012-013094 Judge: Gentry, Jo Lynn
File Date: 8/24/2012 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Save Our Vote Opposing C-03-2012   Plaintiff    Michael Liburdi 
Safeguard Arizonas Future   Plaintiff    Michael Liburdi 
Lisa Gray   Plaintiff  Female  Michael Liburdi 
Ken Bennett   Defendant  Male  Michele Forney 
Helen Purcell   Defendant  Female  Colleen Connor 
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors   Defendant    Colleen Connor 
Fulton Brock   Defendant  Male  Colleen Connor 
Max Wilson   Defendant  Male  Colleen Connor 
Mary Rose Wilcox   Defendant  Female  Colleen Connor 
Don Stapley   Defendant  Male  Colleen Connor 
Open Government Committee Supporting C-03-2012   Defendant    Kimberly Demarchi 
Andrew Kunasek   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
2/27/2013  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit  3/5/2013   
NOTE: $500 PAID TO KIMBRERLY A DEMARCHI 
2/22/2013  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond  2/22/2013   
NOTE: Order TO EXONERATE AND RELEASE COST BOND 
2/19/2013  MOT - Motion  2/20/2013   
NOTE: Motion for Exoneration of Cost Bond 
2/7/2013  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit  2/21/2013   
NOTE: SAVE OUR VOTE $500.00 
2/7/2013  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond  2/7/2013   
NOTE: ORDER TO EXONERATE AND RELEASE APPEAL BOND 
1/30/2013  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  1/30/2013   
1/29/2013  MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond  1/30/2013   
NOTE: Motion to Exonerate and Release Appeal Bond 
11/2/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  11/5/2012   
NOTE: EROA 
11/2/2012  AIX - Appeals Index  11/5/2012   
NOTE: EROA 
10/16/2012  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  10/18/2012   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS ORDER 
9/10/2012  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  9/19/2012   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT 
9/10/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  9/11/2012   
9/10/2012  AIX - Appeals Index  9/11/2012   
9/6/2012  ORD - Order  9/10/2012   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT DECISON ORDER - AFFIRMED 
9/6/2012  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  9/13/2012   
NOTE: $500 APPEAL BOND/COST BOND SAVE OUR VOTE 
9/5/2012  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  9/13/2012   
NOTE: $500 APPEAL BOND/COST BOND OPEN GOVENRNMENT COMMITTE SUPPORTING C-03-2012 
9/5/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  9/5/2012   
9/5/2012  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  9/5/2012   
9/4/2012  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  9/4/2012   
9/4/2012  ORD - Order  9/10/2012   
NOTE: SUPREME COURT ORDER 
8/31/2012  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  9/4/2012   
8/31/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  8/31/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Cross-Appeal / eFile Billing $614.00 
8/31/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  9/4/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal 
8/30/2012  WSH - Worksheet  9/6/2012   
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING 
8/29/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Secretary Ken Bennett's Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2012  RES - Response  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Response Opposing Motion to Consolidate 
8/29/2012  RES - Response  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Response In Opposition to Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2012  MOT - Motion  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) Motion re Open Government Committee's Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2012  AFF - Affidavit  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Plaintiff Save Our Vote's Rule 56(f) Affidavit in Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2012  RES - Response  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Response in Oppositon to The Secretary of State's Motion to Dismiss 
8/29/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/30/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
8/28/2012  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/29/2012   
NOTE: eFile Billing $223.00 
8/28/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
8/28/2012  AMC - Amended Complaint  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Amended Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief 
8/28/2012  NOT - Notice  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Notice re: Amended Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Mandamus Relief 
8/28/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss 
8/28/2012  NOT - Notice  8/29/2012   
NOTE: Verification of Lisa Gray 
8/27/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/28/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
8/27/2012  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/28/2012   
8/27/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/28/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance-Co Chrg Receipt #22416231 
8/27/2012  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  8/28/2012   
NOTE: Defendant Maricopa Countys Notice of Appearance 
8/27/2012  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  8/28/2012   
NOTE: CO-CHG FOR HELEN PURCELL, MARICOPA CONTY BOARD OF SUPERVISORS, ANDREW KUNASEK, FULTON BROCK, MAX WILSON, MARY ROSE WILCOX, DON STAPLEY FOR APPEARANCE FEE/RECEIPT # 22416498 
8/27/2012  OSC - Order To Show Cause  8/31/2012   
8/24/2012  COM - Complaint  8/24/2012   
8/24/2012  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  8/24/2012   
8/24/2012  APL - Application  8/24/2012   
NOTE: FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
8/29/2012  13:30  Status Conference 
8/29/2012  16:00  Oral Argument 
8/30/2012  13:00  Election Challenge 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Self-Service Center