Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2011-054379 Judge: Duncan, Sally
File Date: 7/1/2011 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Glenn A Edwards   Plaintiff  Male  Christopher Lonn 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Male  Geoffrey Walker 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/23/2012  JUD - Judgment  4/6/2012   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
3/13/2012  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  3/13/2012   
3/9/2012  SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment  3/12/2012   
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment 
3/7/2012  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  3/8/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Settlement 
2/7/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  2/7/2012   
2/6/2012  REQ - Request  2/6/2012   
NOTE: Request for Rule 16(b) Comprehensive Pretrial Conference 
1/25/2012  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  1/25/2012   
1/16/2012  NOT - Notice  1/17/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
12/7/2011  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  12/7/2011   
10/12/2011  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  10/14/2011   
10/12/2011  ANS - Answer  10/19/2011   
NOTE: PAID 
9/29/2011  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  9/29/2011   
9/27/2011  AFF - Affidavit  9/28/2011   
NOTE: Affidavit in Support of Application and Notice of Entry of Default AGAINST SABIN L. BURRELL 
9/27/2011  ADE - Application For Default  9/28/2011   
NOTE: Application and Notice of Entry of Default 
9/1/2011  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/7/2011   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL SERVED 08/25/11 
9/1/2011  SUM - Summons  9/7/2011   
7/1/2011  COM - Complaint  7/5/2011   
7/1/2011  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  7/5/2011   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/23/2012  F:Glenn A Edwards  $200,000.00  One Time  Principal   
  A: Sabin L Burrell