« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-021906
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
12/15/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Harrison Morton
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Burton Bentley
Party Name
Deena Morton
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Burton Bentley
Party Name
Robert Proctor
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
AMY ABDO
Party Name
Sandra Gallagher
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
AMY ABDO
Party Name
Six Minutes L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
AMY ABDO
Party Name
International Education Systems Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
AMY ABDO
Party Name
Life Success Productions L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
AMY ABDO
Party Name
Morton Enterprises L L C
Relationship
Counter Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2020
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
6/24/2020
Filing Party
NOTE:
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2012
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/13/2012
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/7/2012
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
9/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO SET AND CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Filing Date
8/30/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/30/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO MOTION TO MODIFY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
8/20/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/21/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE of Settlement Conference
Filing Date
8/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Six Minutes, LLC's Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
7/30/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
7/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/25/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Six Minutes, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violation of Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
7/23/2012
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/1/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/18/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2012
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
7/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO APPLICATION FOR CONTEMPT
Filing Date
7/11/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
7/11/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING
Filing Date
7/6/2012
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Six Minutes, LLC's Application for Order to Show Cause Why Plaintiffs Should Not Be Held in Contempt for Violation of Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
7/2/2012
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
7/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STATUS/SCHEDULING MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
6/7/2012
Description
PHO - Pro Hac Vice Order
Docket Date
6/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF SHAWN A. MANGANO
Filing Date
6/4/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/4/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2012
Description
PHA - Pro Hac Vice Application
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Associate Counsel Pro Hac Vice for Shawn A. Mangano and Consent of Local Counsel
Filing Date
5/23/2012
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
5/23/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
5/21/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Regarding Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed To JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Filing Date
4/6/2012
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/6/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/3/2012
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
4/18/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500 PAID BY FENNEMORE CRAIG PC FOR SIX MINUTES LLC/ROBERT PROCTOR
Filing Date
4/2/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants/Counterclaimants' Amended Notice of Posting Bond
Filing Date
3/30/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants/Counterclaimants' Notice of Posting Bond
Filing Date
3/29/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIMANTS' RESPONSE RE: OBJECTION TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/29/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/29/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/26/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/26/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants/Counterclaimants Response to Counterdefendants Objection to $500 Bond and Proposed Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
3/19/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS/ COUNTERDEFENDANTS' OBJECTION TO $500 BOND AND PROPOSED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/14/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/14/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
3/13/2012
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
3/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2012
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
3/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/10/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/10/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants' Reply to VERIFIED Counterclaim
Filing Date
1/31/2012
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
1/31/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/24/2012
Description
004 - ME: Hearing Continued
Docket Date
1/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING
COUNTERCLAIMANTS’ MOTION
FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN
OVERSIZED BRIEF
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
LIFE SUCCESS PRODUCTIONS LLC 12/24/11
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
SIX MINUTES L L C SERVED 12/24/2011
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION SYSTEMS INC 12/24/11
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/25/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ROBERT PROCTOR 12/24/11
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
1/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF HARRISON MORTON AS ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE NEVADA CASE
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Answer to First Amended Complaint and Verified Counterclaim / EFILE BILLING $223
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterclaimants' Motion for Leave to File An Oversized Brief
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Counterclaimant's Application For And Memorandum of Law in Support of Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
1/13/2012
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Declaration of Sandra Gallagher in Support of Counterdefendants' Application for and Memorandum of Law in Support of Temporary Restraining Order with Notice and Preliminary Injunction
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
First Amended Complaint
Filing Date
12/16/2011
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
12/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ACCELERATED DISCOVERY
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
12/15/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROPOSED/ RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/3/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
1/11/2012
Time
8:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/18/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
1/20/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/25/2012
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
1/27/2012
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
5/31/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
7/26/2012
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/18/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
10/22/2012
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.