« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-017914
Judge:
Agne, Sara
File Date:
9/27/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Jean Cabou
Party Name
Thomas C Horne
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Mark Wilson
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss / CO-CHG Receipt #21678106
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
CO-CHG Receipt #21678106
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
THOMAS C HORNE 09/27/11
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.