« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2011-016442 Judge: Whitten, Christopher
File Date: 9/7/2011 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
State Of Arizona   Plaintiff    Colleen Connor 
Thomas C Horne   Plaintiff  Male  Colleen Connor 
Colleen Mathis   Defendant  Female  Kiersten Murphy 
Linda McNulty   Defendant  Female  Roopali Desai 
Jose Herrera   Defendant  Male  Timothy Nelson 
Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission   Plaintiff    Jean Cabou 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/17/2013  MAN - Order Of Mandate  1/22/2013   
NOTE: AFFIRMED 
1/17/2013  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  1/22/2013   
5/30/2012  LET - Letter  6/1/2012   
NOTE: FROM SUPREME COURT ORDER RE: PETTION FOR TRANSFER DENIED 
5/10/2012  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  5/14/2012   
4/16/2012  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  4/17/2012   
3/7/2012  019 - ME: Ruling  3/7/2012   
2/9/2012  LET - Letter  2/14/2012   
NOTE: COURT OF APPEALS/ 
2/8/2012  LET - Letter  2/9/2012   
2/1/2012  REC - Receipt  2/2/2012   
NOTE: C2V TRANSMISSION RECEIPT 
1/27/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  1/27/2012   
NOTE: Motion to Dismiss Appeal 
1/26/2012  AIX - Appeals Index  1/31/2012   
1/17/2012  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  1/18/2012   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / Co-Chg Receipt #21891920 
12/20/2011  CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement  12/21/2011   
NOTE: Civil Appeals Docketing Statement 
12/20/2011  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  12/21/2011   
12/19/2011  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  12/20/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Appeal / CO-CHG REC# 21836206 
12/16/2011  JUD - Judgment  12/19/2011   
NOTE: FINAL JUDGMENT 
12/15/2011  NOT - Notice  12/16/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Form of Judgment and Stipulation Regarding Form of Judgment 
12/12/2011  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  12/12/2011   
11/29/2011  NOT - Notice  11/30/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE of Supplemental Authority 
11/18/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  11/18/2011   
11/16/2011  RES - Response  11/17/2011   
NOTE: COMMISSIONER HERRERA’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND JOINDER IN COMMISSIONER MCNULTY’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S CROSSMOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
11/15/2011  REQ - Request  11/15/2011   
NOTE: Request for Judicial Notice 
11/10/2011  REL - Reply  11/14/2011   
NOTE: COMMISSIONER COLLEEN MATHIS’ JOINDER IN AIRC’S CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO PETITIONER’S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND COMMISSIONER LINDA MCNULTY’S RESPONSE TO STATE’S CROSS-Motion for summary judgment 
11/9/2011  REL - Reply  11/10/2011   
NOTE: Plaintiff Arizona Independant Redistricting Commission's Consolidated Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Petitioner's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
11/9/2011  RES - Response  11/10/2011   
NOTE: Commissioner McNulty's Response to State's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
11/9/2011  SOF - Statement Of Facts  11/10/2011   
NOTE: ARIZONA INDEPENDENT REDISTRICTING COMMISSION’S AND COMMISSIONERS’ CONSOLIDATED OBJECTION AND CONTROVERTING STATEMENT OF FACTS IN RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S STATEMENT OF FACTS SUPPORTING THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
11/7/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/7/2011   
11/2/2011  MOT - Motion  11/3/2011   
NOTE: Petitioner's Motion to Reinstate Date for Oral Argument and Motion for Substitution 
11/1/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  11/2/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance of Petitioner State of Arizona 
10/28/2011  926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling  10/28/2011   
10/26/2011  REL - Reply  10/27/2011   
NOTE: Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss 
10/26/2011  NOT - Notice  10/27/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Errata 
10/25/2011  REL - Reply  10/27/2011   
NOTE: Reply and Support of Motion to Dismiss 
10/25/2011  RES - Response  10/27/2011   
NOTE: Petitioner's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 
10/25/2011  SOF - Statement Of Facts  10/27/2011   
NOTE: Petitioner's Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Motion for Summary Judgment 
10/20/2011  RES - Response  10/21/2011   
NOTE: Defendant Commissioners' Joinder in Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission's Response to Motion to Dismiss AND Motion for Summary Judgment 
10/19/2011  NOT - Notice  10/20/2011   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ARIZONA INDEPENDENT REDISTRICTING COMMISSION’S NOTICE OF ERRATA 
10/19/2011  RES - Response  10/20/2011   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ARIZONA INDEPENDENT REDISTRICTING COMMISSION’S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/18/2011  RES - Response  10/19/2011   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ARIZONA INDEPENDENT REDISTRCTING COMMISSION’S CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
10/18/2011  SOF - Statement Of Facts  10/19/2011   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF ARIZONA INDEPENDENT REDISTRICTING COMMISSION’S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS 
10/18/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  10/18/2011   
10/17/2011  ORD - Order  10/18/2011   
NOTE: ORDER REGARDING SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL 
10/17/2011  RES - Response  10/18/2011   
NOTE: Response to Supplementation of Record 
10/16/2011  NOT - Notice  10/17/2011   
NOTE: Defendants' Supplementation of Record Re Motion for Disqualification 
10/13/2011  RES - Response  10/14/2011   
NOTE: Response to "Noticer of Having Provided File" 
10/13/2011  STP - Stipulation  10/14/2011   
NOTE: STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL 
10/12/2011  REQ - Request  10/13/2011   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER AND TRANSCRIPT OF OCTOBER 14, 2011 ORAL ARGUMENT 
10/12/2011  REL - Reply  10/13/2011   
NOTE: JOINDER OF DEFENDANT COMMISSIONER JOSE HERRERA IN REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL 
10/12/2011  NOT - Notice  10/13/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Having Provided File 
10/11/2011  REL - Reply  10/12/2011   
NOTE: Joinder in Commissioner McNulty's Reply in Support of Motion for Disqualification of Counsel 
10/11/2011  REL - Reply  10/12/2011   
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion for Disqualification of Counsel 
10/6/2011  053 - ME: Case Consolidation  10/6/2011   
10/3/2011  RES - Response  10/3/2011   
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND MEMORANDUM REGARDING ASSERTIONS IN THE NEW COMPLAINT 
10/3/2011  MOT - Motion  10/3/2011   
NOTE: COMMISSIONER COLLEEN MATHIS’ JOINDER IN COMMISSIONER LINDA McNULTY’S MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL 
10/3/2011  MOT - Motion  10/3/2011   
NOTE: Motion for Disqualification of Counsel 
10/3/2011  RES - Response  10/3/2011   
NOTE: Response to Motion for Disqualification of Counsel 
10/3/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  10/3/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
10/3/2011  MOT - Motion  10/4/2011   
NOTE: JOINDER OF DEFENDANT COMMISSSIONER JOSE HERRERA IN MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL 
10/3/2011  REQ - Request  10/4/2011   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR TRANSCRIPT OF OCTOBER 3, 2010 HEARING 
10/3/2011  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  10/3/2011   
NOTE: CO-CHG Receipt #21677514 
9/30/2011  REQ - Request  10/3/2011   
NOTE: REQUEST FOR COURT REPORTER RE OCTOBER 3, 2011 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING 
9/16/2011  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  9/19/2011   
9/16/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  9/19/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Appearance 
9/14/2011  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/15/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Affidavit 
9/13/2011  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  9/14/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 
9/13/2011  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  9/14/2011   
9/8/2011  OSC - Order To Show Cause  9/15/2011   
9/7/2011  COM - Complaint  9/8/2011   
9/7/2011  EXH - Exhibit  9/8/2011   
NOTE: TO PETITION FOR ENFORCEMENT OF WRITTEN INVESTIGATIVE DEMANDS AND APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 
9/7/2011  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  9/8/2011   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
10/3/2011  11:00  Order To Show Cause 
10/14/2011  13:30  Oral Argument 
11/7/2011  14:30  Oral Argument 
11/16/2011  10:00  Oral Argument 
11/30/2011  11:00  Status Conference 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
12/16/2011  F:Arizona Independent Redistricting Commission    One Time  Judgment Only   
  A: State Of Arizona         
click here for Law Library Resource Center