« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-015853
Judge:
Adleman, Jay
File Date:
9/23/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Mary Lou Boettcher
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Thomas Ryan
Party Name
Ken Bennett
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
James Barton
Party Name
Helen Purcell
Relationship
DEFT/Appellant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Fulton Brock
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Andrew Kunasek
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Don Stapley
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Mary Rose Wilcox
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Max Wilson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Colleen Connor
Party Name
Olivia Cortes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Anthony Tsontakis
Party Name
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Maricopa County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2020
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
7/6/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/17/2020
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
4/17/2020
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2011
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT ORDER
Filing Date
10/7/2011
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2011
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2011
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
10/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss Verified Election Complaint Request to Vacate Hearing
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/13/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/2011
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT OF ARIZONA/DENYING THE APPLICATION FOR INTERLOCUTORY STAY AND THE APPLICATION FOR ACCELERATED CONSIDERATION
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/6/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPREME COURT OF ARIZONA/SUBMITTING PETITION FOR RULING WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT, DIRECTING SERVICE, AND FIXING TIME FOR RESPONSE AND REPLY
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
926 - ME: Under Advisement Ruling
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Emergency Motion for Relief
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2011
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
WSH - Worksheet
Docket Date
10/4/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
HEARING
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
10/11/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff Boettcher's Joint Response To Motions to Dismiss/Cross-Motion to Amend Verified Complaint
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Secretary of State's Answer-Co Chrg Receipt #21668614
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Waiver of Service of Process - OLIVIA CORTES 09/28/11
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
LOW - List Of Witnesses/Exhibit/Evidence
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's List of Witnesses and Exhibits
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants Maricopa County Board of Supervisors and Maricopa County Recorder's Answer CO-CHG R#21669972
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Cortes Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant Cortes Notice of Appearance of Counsel
Filing Date
9/28/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$223.00 RECEIVED FROM ANTHONY TSONTAKIS FOR OLIVIA CORTES FOR APPEARANCE FEE
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO APPEAR
Filing Date
9/27/2011
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
9/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MARY LOU BOETTCHER IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
9/26/2011
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT
Filing Date
9/23/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/23/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/29/2011
Time
9:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
10/4/2011
Time
9:15
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/7/2011
Time
13:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
10/7/2011
Time
15:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.