« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2011-010634
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
6/21/2011
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Gary L Thompson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Sarah Deutsch
Party Name
Coralee Thompson
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sarah Deutsch
Party Name
P H N X Housing Solutions I, L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Sarah Deutsch
Party Name
John F Ray
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Investors Alliance L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Great American Title Agency Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bank Of America N A
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jpmorgan Chase Bank N A
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Wells Fargo Bank
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/28/2017
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
5/1/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT - Efile billing $27
Filing Date
4/3/2015
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/3/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2015
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
4/21/2015
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/3/2015
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
3/4/2015
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants
Filing Date
7/22/2014
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION
OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
7/11/2014
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/14/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Defendants with Consent
Filing Date
7/1/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/2/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/20/2014
Description
039 - ME: Judgment Debtor Exam
Docket Date
6/20/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/13/2014
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/16/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Protective Order
Filing Date
6/5/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/6/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/27/2014
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/28/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2014
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/21/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Filing Date
5/21/2014
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
5/22/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance for Defendants
Filing Date
5/13/2014
Description
OJA - Order Req. Jdgmnt/Debtor Appear For Exam
Docket Date
5/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION
Filing Date
5/6/2014
Description
MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear
Docket Date
5/6/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION FOR ORDER REQUIRING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION-efile billing $27.00
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
OJA - Order Req. Jdgmnt/Debtor Appear For Exam
Docket Date
3/21/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
SHERIFF'S VACATE OF LEVY ON REAL ESTATE
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
RWT – Return of Writ
Docket Date
3/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
WRT - Writ
Docket Date
3/24/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GENERAL EXECUTION
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
RWT – Return of Writ
Docket Date
3/24/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2014
Description
APU - Affidavit Of Publication
Docket Date
3/27/2014
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/13/2014
Description
MJA - Mot/Ord Req Jud/Dbtr To Appear
Docket Date
3/13/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion Requiring Judgment Debtor Examination / E-FILE BILLING $27
Filing Date
1/8/2014
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
1/9/2014
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION
Filing Date
12/16/2013
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/18/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
RWT – Return of Writ
Docket Date
11/5/2013
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2013
Description
WRT - Writ
Docket Date
11/5/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF GENERAL EXECUTION
Filing Date
10/1/2013
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/3/2013
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION
Filing Date
10/5/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING
Filing Date
10/4/2012
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/4/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request to Vacate Order to Show Cause Hearing
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN F RAY 09/13/2012
Filing Date
10/3/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
9/18/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/26/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(9)
Filing Date
9/18/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/27/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(8)
Filing Date
9/17/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/25/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(9)
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
9/11/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDATS
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/13/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(6)
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(6)
Filing Date
9/10/2012
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(7)
Filing Date
9/7/2012
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
9/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/4/2012
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
9/10/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2012
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/31/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Petition for Charging Order Against Interest of Defendant John F. Ray in AIA Holdings LLC And Application for Order to Show Cause
Filing Date
5/8/2012
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
5/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2012
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
5/7/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Change of Attorney Within Firm
Filing Date
5/1/2012
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/23/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/24/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to Form of Judgment Filed By Plaintiff PHNX Housing Solutions, L.L.C.
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
4/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Objection to Form of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff PHNX Housing Solutions, L.L.C.
Filing Date
4/13/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/16/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment
Filing Date
3/22/2012
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/22/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/8/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply In Support Of Their Motion For Summary Judgment
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Their Motion For Summary Judgment
Filing Date
1/24/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/24/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/12/2012
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
1/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Statement of Facts in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
1/12/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/13/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/27/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/29/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
12/21/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Joint Proposed Scheduling Order
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/13/2011
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
12/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/30/2011
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
11/30/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2011
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/23/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
11/9/2011
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
11/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Entry of Default of Defendants
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit In Support Of Default of Defendants
Filing Date
9/29/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANSWER
Filing Date
9/12/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/1/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/2/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF EXTENSION TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE
Filing Date
8/30/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/30/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED NOTICE OF EXTENSION TO REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE
Filing Date
8/15/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/15/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiffs' Response In Opposition To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
$223.00 RECEIVED FROM CROSBY & GLADNER P C FOR JOHN F RAY AND ARIZONA INVESTORS ALLIANCE L L C FOR ANSWER/APPEARANCE FEE
Filing Date
7/26/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/26/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Dismiss/Paid $223.00 Receipt # 21525421
Filing Date
7/1/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/7/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARIZONA INVESTORS ALLIANCE LLC 06/30/11
Filing Date
6/28/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN F RAY SERVED 06/24/2011
Filing Date
6/21/2011
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/22/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2011
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/22/2011
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/7/2012
Time
9:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
5/1/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/4/2012
Time
15:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
4/21/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Date
6/16/2014
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/1/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
P H N X Housing Solutions I, L L C
A: John F Ray
A: John F Ray
Amount
$1,274,182.46
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
5/1/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
P H N X Housing Solutions I, L L C
A: John F Ray
A: John F Ray
Amount
$1,127,659.14
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified