« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2010-002756
Judge:
Hannah, John
File Date:
1/26/2010
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Bruce K Childers Ltd
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
J LINDER
Party Name
Andrew Kacic
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Burce Childers
Relationship
Counter Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
J LINDER
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2018
Description
RNM - Returned Mail
Docket Date
12/7/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Returned Mail Minute Entry
Filing Date
10/8/2018
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
10/8/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Order
Filing Date
10/4/2018
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
10/4/2018
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Counsel
Filing Date
4/6/2017
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
4/7/2017
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment Renewal Affidavit / EFILE BILLING $27
Filing Date
6/5/2012
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
6/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2012
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
6/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
5/16/2012
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Statement of Costs
Filing Date
5/16/2012
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
5/17/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit Re: Attorney Fees
Filing Date
5/11/2012
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
5/18/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Lodging Proposed Form of Judgment
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Whitney M. Harvey in Support of Application for Attorney Fees
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff/counterdefendants' Application for Attorneys Fees
Filing Date
4/20/2012
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
4/23/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff/Counterdefendants' Statement of Costs
Filing Date
4/9/2012
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
4/9/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/2012
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/30/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/2012
Description
OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel
Docket Date
4/13/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2012
Description
MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel
Docket Date
3/1/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Leave to Withdraw As Counsel Without Client Consent
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF/ COUNTERDEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF/ COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR
PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
2/1/2012
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/2/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANTS’ REPLY TO DEFENDANT’S CONTESTED
STATEMENT OF FACTS AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT’S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS
Filing Date
1/18/2012
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
1/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF/COUNTERDEFENDANTS TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2012
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
1/17/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/5/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ COUNTERCLAIMANT’S
RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/5/2012
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/6/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT’S/ COUNTERCLAIMANT’SResponse to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
12/22/2011
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/23/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Response Deadline
Filing Date
12/19/2011
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
12/19/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2011
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
12/16/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's/Counterclaimant's Motion to Continue
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
11/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff/Counterdefendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/18/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff Counterdefendants' Separate Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING
DISPOSITIVE MOTION
DEADLINE
Filing Date
11/11/2011
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/14/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Third Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline
Filing Date
11/1/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/1/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/20/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER EXTENDING
DISPOSITIVE MOTION
DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/17/2011
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING MOTION DEADLINE AND SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Request for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
Filing Date
10/14/2011
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/17/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Second Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadline
Filing Date
10/5/2011
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
10/5/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/3/2011
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/3/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Extend Motion Deadline and Request for Settlement Conference
Filing Date
9/9/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Complaint
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/31/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Defendant's/Counterclaimant's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
7/27/2011
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
7/27/2011
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintif's Motion for Summary Judgment
Filing Date
7/22/2011
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Clarify Court's Order Regarding Expert Disclosure
Filing Date
6/24/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Attorney's Lien
Filing Date
6/24/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/27/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF
CYNTHIA CHRISTIE-LEE
Filing Date
6/9/2011
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Fifth Supplemental Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Deposition of Cynthia Christie-Lee
Filing Date
6/8/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Deposition of Franks
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
6/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF/COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Filing Date
6/7/2011
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
6/7/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2011
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
6/1/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Joint Pretrial Statement
Filing Date
5/27/2011
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/27/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
5/12/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Fourth Supplemental Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
4/21/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
4/21/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF THIRD
SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURE
STATEMENT
Filing Date
4/4/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTERDEFENDANTS BRUCE CHILDERS, LTD. AND BRUCE CHILDERS' MOTION TO DISMISS REGARDING PIERCING THE CORPORATE VEIL
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/25/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Reply in Support of Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
3/25/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
3/28/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT KACIC’S Response to Bruce Childers LTD AND BRUCE CHILDERS' Motion to Dismiss Regarding Piercing the Corporate Veil
Filing Date
3/21/2011
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/22/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Set and Request to Join Trials
Filing Date
3/18/2011
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
3/18/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/8/2011
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
3/8/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/22/2011
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
2/24/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
REGARDING PIERCING THE CORPORATE VEIL
Filing Date
2/9/2011
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SERVICE OF SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
2/9/2011
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
2/11/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
12/6/2010
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Verification of Initial Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
11/23/2010
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/29/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOWI FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
11/15/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ AND COUNTERCLAIMANT KACICS COMPLAINT FOR LEGAL NEGLIGENCE/MALPRACTICE/BREACH
Filing Date
11/15/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/1/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIMANT KACIDS COMPLAINT FOR LEGAL NEGLIGENCE/MALPRACTICE/BREACH
Filing Date
11/15/2010
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ACCEPT SERVICE
Filing Date
11/15/2010
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/22/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ALLOW FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/8/2010
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/14/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2010
Description
339 - ME: 100 Day Notice
Docket Date
8/25/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/5/2010
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Counterclaimants Initial Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
8/5/2010
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Defendants Initial Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
8/4/2010
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
8/5/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Appearance
Filing Date
7/19/2010
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
7/20/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Disclosure Statement
Filing Date
6/30/2010
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
6/30/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/25/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANTS COUNTER-CLAIM
Filing Date
5/10/2010
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
5/18/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
5/10/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/19/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
BRUCE CHILDERS LTD SERVED 03/17/2010
Filing Date
3/19/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/24/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/19/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/23/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/8/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
3/4/2010
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
3/8/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2010
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/8/2010
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
2/12/2010
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/17/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
ANDREW KACIC AND JANE DOE KACIC SERVED 2/7/10
Filing Date
2/12/2010
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
2/19/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2010
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
1/27/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/26/2010
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
1/27/2010
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
5/10/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/3/2011
Time
16:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
6/7/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/7/2011
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/15/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
12/15/2011
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Date
2/17/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/26/2012
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
4/6/2012
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd, Burce Childers
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$209,780.56
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd, Burce Childers
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$61,955.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd, Burce Childers
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$4,519.41
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$2,622.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Modified
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$419.20
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
6/4/2012
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Bruce K Childers Ltd
A: Andrew Kacic
A: Andrew Kacic
Amount
$54,212.68
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified