Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2009-028379 Judge: Albrecht, Richard
File Date: 9/9/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Arizona Central Credit Union   Plaintiff    Madeleine Wanslee 
Sabin L Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Compass Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Robert W Baird & Co   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
M & I Marshall & Ilsley Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Blue Square Resolutions L L C   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Jpmorgan Chase Bank   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Bank Of America N A   Garnishee Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
12/28/2016  SJG - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO GARNISHEE ONLY  12/29/2016   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment on Writ of Garnishment 
12/28/2016  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  12/29/2016   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment and Release of Lien in Full 
12/28/2016  RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment  12/29/2016   
NOTE: Release and Ex Parte Quash of Writ of Garnishment (Blue Square Resolutions, LLC) 
11/22/2016  RNM - Returned Mail  11/22/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
11/22/2016  RNM - Returned Mail  11/22/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
11/21/2016  RNM - Returned Mail  11/21/2016   
NOTE: Returned Mail Minute Entry 
11/9/2016  022 - ME: Order Signed  11/9/2016   
11/8/2016  ORD - Order  11/21/2016   
NOTE: STIPULATED / REGARDING DISTRIBUTION OF GARNISHED FUNDS 
9/29/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  9/30/2016  Garnishee Defendant(7)  
NOTE: Garnishee's Answer (Non-Earnings) 
9/21/2016  RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment  9/22/2016   
NOTE: Release and Quash of Writ of Garnishment 
9/21/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/28/2016   
9/19/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  9/30/2016  Garnishee Defendant(7)  
9/19/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  9/30/2016  Garnishee Defendant(8)  
9/13/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/21/2016   
9/13/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/21/2016   
9/12/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/20/2016   
9/12/2016  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  9/14/2016   
NOTE: FOR MONIES OR PROPERTY 
9/12/2016  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  9/14/2016   
NOTE: FOR MONIES OR PROPERTY 
9/12/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/20/2016   
9/8/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  9/12/2016   
9/8/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  9/12/2016   
9/1/2016  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  9/1/2016  Garnishee Defendant(6)  
NOTE: Garnishee's Answer (Earnings) 
8/23/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/29/2016   
8/23/2016  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  8/29/2016   
8/23/2016  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  8/26/2016   
8/23/2016  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  8/26/2016   
NOTE: FOR MONIES OR PROPERTY 
8/18/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  8/19/2016   
8/18/2016  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  8/19/2016   
1/14/2015  ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment  1/14/2015   
NOTE: Affidavit of Judgment Renewal / E-FILE BILLING $27 
1/12/2012  CAW - Civil Arrest Warrant  1/18/2012   
9/16/2010  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  9/20/2010   
8/6/2010  097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued  8/6/2010   
8/2/2010  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  8/13/2010   
8/2/2010  WRT - Writ  8/5/2010   
NOTE: OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
7/22/2010  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  7/22/2010   
7/22/2010  NOT - Notice  7/22/2010   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
7/5/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/13/2010   
6/15/2010  PRA - Praecipe  6/17/2010   
NOTE: WRIT OF GENERAL EXECUTION 
6/8/2010  AFF - Affidavit  6/11/2010   
NOTE: AND APPLICAITON FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAM 
6/2/2010  SJG - SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO GARNISHEE ONLY  6/2/2010   
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment on Writ of Garnishment 
4/23/2010  JAG - Judgment Against Garnishee  7/16/2010   
4/15/2010  APL - Application  4/19/2010   
NOTE: FOR JUDGMENT ON WRIT OF GARNISHMENT 
4/14/2010  RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment  4/19/2010   
4/14/2010  RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment  4/19/2010   
4/1/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  4/8/2010  Garnishee Defendant(5)  
3/31/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  4/5/2010   
3/31/2010  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  4/7/2010   
3/24/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  3/30/2010  Garnishee Defendant(4)  
3/23/2010  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  3/25/2010   
3/22/2010  ANG - Answer Of Garnishee  3/25/2010  Garnishee Defendant(3)  
3/12/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/16/2010   
3/12/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/16/2010   
3/12/2010  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/16/2010   
3/12/2010  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  3/16/2010   
3/12/2010  WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons  3/16/2010   
3/12/2010  SDT - Subpoena Duces Tecum  3/16/2010   
3/4/2010  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  3/9/2010   
3/4/2010  AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment  3/9/2010   
2/10/2010  DFJ - Default Judgment  2/16/2010   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
2/10/2010  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  2/10/2010   
2/3/2010  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  2/5/2010   
2/3/2010  SOC - Statement Of Costs  2/5/2010   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
2/3/2010  MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear  2/5/2010   
12/31/2009  ADE - Application For Default  1/11/2010   
12/31/2009  AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default  1/11/2010   
12/4/2009  SUM - Summons  12/10/2009   
12/2/2009  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  12/9/2009   
NOTE: SERVED SABIN L BURRELL 11/28/09 NAIL AND MAIL 
12/2/2009  AMS - Affidavit Alternative Method of Service  12/9/2009   
NOTE: SERVED SABIN L BURRELL 11/28/09 NAIL AND MAIL 
11/20/2009  ORD - Order  11/30/2009   
NOTE: AUTHORIZING ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE 
11/9/2009  MOT - Motion  11/13/2009   
NOTE: TO APPROVE ALTERNATIVE METHOD OF SERVICE 
9/9/2009  COM - Complaint  9/11/2009   
9/9/2009  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  9/11/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/20/2010  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
8/4/2010  13:30  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
1/14/2015  F:Arizona Central Credit Union  $92,748.72  One Time  Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
2/10/2010  F:Arizona Central Credit Union  $463.60  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
2/10/2010  F:Arizona Central Credit Union  $1,374.45  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
2/10/2010  F:Arizona Central Credit Union  $763.57  One Time  Interest  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell         
2/10/2010  F:Arizona Central Credit Union  $44,951.14  One Time  Principal  Satisfied 
  A: Sabin L Burrell