« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2009-012726
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
4/21/2009
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Hamid Shojaee
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Gregory Collins
Party Name
Lawdan Shojaee
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Gregory Collins
Party Name
Byron J Augustine
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Wade Burgeson
Party Name
Amy Augustine
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Wade Burgeson
Party Name
Q Restaurant Group L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Wade Burgeson
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2009
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER OF DISMISSAL, WITH
PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/22/2009
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
10/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Dismiss, With Prejudice
Filing Date
9/23/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/8/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Q RESTAURANT GROUP LLC SERVED 5-11-2009
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
BYRON J AUGUSTINE SERVED 5-11-2009
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMY AUGUSTINE SERVED 5-11-2009
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/21/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/23/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.