« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2005-051786 Judge: Rees, Brian
File Date: 8/5/2005 Location: Northeast
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Covenant Commission Inc, The   Plaintiff    Lisa Bliss 
Steven J Rosenstein   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Andrea L Rosenstein   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/8/2007  SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment  3/13/2007   
NOTE: AND RELEASE OF JUDGMENT LIEN 
9/12/2006  OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar  9/19/2006   
8/29/2006  AAF - Application For Attorney Fees  8/29/2006   
8/29/2006  ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees  8/29/2006   
8/29/2006  SOC - Statement Of Costs  8/29/2006   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
8/28/2006  DFJ - Default Judgment  8/30/2006   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
8/7/2006  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  8/10/2006   
NOTE: DEFAULT 
8/3/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  8/8/2006   
7/26/2006  NOS - Notice Of Settlement  7/31/2006   
NOTE: No document corresponds to this docket event. 
7/17/2006  OCC - Order Continuing On Inactive Calendar  7/20/2006   
6/22/2006  MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar  6/26/2006   
6/19/2006  NOT - Notice  6/22/2006   
NOTE: OF ERRATA 
6/6/2006  NOH - Notice Of Hearing  6/9/2006   
NOTE: DEFAULT 
5/15/2006  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  5/17/2006   
5/12/2006  ADE - Application For Default  5/16/2006   
5/12/2006  AFD - Affidavit On Default  5/16/2006   
5/2/2006  MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness  5/4/2006   
1/11/2006  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  1/11/2006   
9/1/2005  LOR - Location Reassignment  9/1/2005   
8/30/2005  SUM - Summons  9/1/2005   
8/30/2005  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  9/1/2005   
NOTE: STEVEN J ROSENSTEIN AND ANDREA L ROSENSTEIN SERVED 08/23/05 
8/29/2005  LOR - Location Reassignment  8/29/2005   
8/5/2005  COM - Complaint  8/9/2005   
8/5/2005  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  8/9/2005   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
7/10/2006  9:00  Default Hearing 
8/28/2006  9:00  Default Hearing 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
8/28/2006  F:Covenant Commission Inc, The  $551.80  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Steven J Rosenstein         
  A: Andrea L Rosenstein         
8/28/2006  F:Covenant Commission Inc, The  $84.56  One Time  Costs  Satisfied 
  A: Steven J Rosenstein         
  A: Andrea L Rosenstein         
8/28/2006  F:Covenant Commission Inc, The  $5,150.00  One Time  Attorney Fee  Satisfied 
  A: Steven J Rosenstein         
  A: Andrea L Rosenstein         
click here for Self-Service Center