« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2005-010961
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
7/7/2005
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Quality Loan Service Corp
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
PAUL LEVINE
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Villa Alegre Association
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Penny Koepke
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/14/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/7/2006
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/15/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY ATTORNEY FOR CLAIMANT/APPLICANT TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT UPCOMING HEARING
Filing Date
5/5/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/5/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/27/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
2/27/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
3/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2006
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
2/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/22/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING RULE 60(A) RELIEF TO APPLICANT VILLA ALEGRE ASSOCIATION
Filing Date
1/12/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
1/4/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/11/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT VILLA ALEGRE ASSOCIATION'S RULE 60(A) TO CORRECT JUDGMENT RE ORDER DIRECTING TREASURER TO RELEASE EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
12/2/2005
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
12/2/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2005
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
12/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2005
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/23/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2005
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2005
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
9/21/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2005
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/19/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
7/12/2005
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/19/2005
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 7-8-2005
Filing Date
7/12/2005
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/19/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2005
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/12/2005
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/7/2005
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/12/2005
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/29/2005
Time
9:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/5/2006
Time
11:30
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.