« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-013331 Judge: Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned
File Date: 7/9/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Hearst Magazines   Plaintiff    Lawrence Fleming 
Fitigues Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
9/22/2004  DFJ - Default Judgment  9/28/2004   
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing 
9/14/2004  SOC - Statement Of Costs  9/20/2004   
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS 
9/14/2004  MOT - Motion  1/19/2006   
NOTE: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITHOUT HEARING AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION 
8/17/2004  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  8/18/2004   
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE 
7/15/2004  SUM - Summons  7/22/2004   
7/15/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  7/21/2004   
NOTE: FITIGUES INC SERVED 07/12/04 
7/9/2004  COM - Complaint  7/13/2004   
7/9/2004  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  7/13/2004   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
9/22/2004  F:Hearst Magazines  $291.40  One Time  Costs   
  A: Fitigues Inc         
9/22/2004  F:Hearst Magazines  $19,975.00  One Time  Principal   
  A: Fitigues Inc         
click here for Self-Service Center