« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2004-004401 Judge: Whitten, Christopher
File Date: 3/8/2004 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
16611 Property L L C   Plaintiff    Joshua Forest 
Fitigues Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/26/2004  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  3/26/2004   
3/17/2004  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  3/17/2004   
3/16/2004  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  4/9/2004   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
3/11/2004  SUM - Summons  4/12/2004   
3/11/2004  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/16/2004   
NOTE: FITIGUES INC SERVED 3-9-2004 
3/8/2004  COM - Complaint  3/10/2004   
3/8/2004  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  3/10/2004   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
3/16/2004  9:00  Forcible Detainer Hearing 
3/23/2004  9:00  Forcible Detainer Hearing 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Self-Service Center