« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2001-004085
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
3/9/2001
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Indra Jhaveri
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mary Jhaveri
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Richard Ira Shear
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Melanie D Shear
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona Asset Partners I Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Epi-Art Palette Llc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Warren Stapleton
Party Name
Artifacts
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael Minnigerode
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Greg Clark
Party Name
James W Gerlach
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Carol Ann Gerlach
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Central Eyeworks Co
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Gaige And Company Art Gallery
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John Schneider
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Starion Investment Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
None
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Ken Moon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Brian P Moon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Cindy Moon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Dennis Moon
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Leonard A Wechsler
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert Aldridge
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael Barreras
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Patricia Barreras
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robert Huillier
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Nancy Schneider
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Robin Huillier
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2003
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/20/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2003
Description
042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full
Docket Date
5/20/2003
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/3/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/18/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/26/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL
Filing Date
9/13/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/5/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RELEASE OF DEPOSIT WITH THE COURT
Filing Date
8/8/2002
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/25/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/8/2002 1:05:00 PM
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
7/8/2002 1:05:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
7/8/2002
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/29/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
REGARDING RELEASE OF TRO BOND
Filing Date
6/28/2002
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
6/28/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2002
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/10/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(7)
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT HEARING
Filing Date
6/21/2002
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
6/27/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF J CHRIS ARNOLD IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/21/2002
Description
MEB - Meb
Docket Date
7/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TRO
Filing Date
6/21/2002
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
7/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND LITIGATION RELATED EXPENSES
Filing Date
6/21/2002
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
7/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AND LITIGATION RELATED EXPENSES
Filing Date
5/28/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/19/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/17/2002
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/17/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/6/2002
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
5/8/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/6/2002
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/21/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT RICHARD IRA SHEAR
Filing Date
5/6/2002
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
5/21/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/6/2002
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/11/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/28/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/11/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/16/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/12/2002
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT RICHARD SHEAR
Filing Date
3/12/2002
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
4/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/12/2002
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
4/2/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/11/2002
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
3/11/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/1/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2002
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/1/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/9/2002
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
1/9/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/4/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/4/2002
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SET
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/7/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/30/2001
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
9/7/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2001
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/21/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
8/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
8/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
7/23/2001
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
THE ARTWORK IN THE ATTACHED EXHIBIT BE RELEASE TO PLA, ALL OTHER ARTWORK NOT SET; FORTH IN EXHIBIT BE RELEASED TO DEF P8
Filing Date
7/10/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/2001
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/25/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(7)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/28/2001
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/3/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
6/28/2001
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
7/18/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(8)
Filing Date
6/26/2001
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
7/16/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(7)
Filing Date
6/22/2001
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY
Filing Date
6/22/2001
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(7)
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY
Filing Date
6/14/2001
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/28/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2001
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/21/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2001
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/19/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2001
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/19/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2001
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
6/12/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE
Filing Date
5/23/2001
Description
RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/8/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/29/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2001
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/11/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2001
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/18/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/15/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXTENDING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Filing Date
5/16/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
5/21/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2001
Description
TRO - Temporary Restraining Order
Docket Date
6/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/9/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P13 SERVED 5-4-2001
Filing Date
5/9/2001
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P19 SERVED 4-30-2001
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P25 SERVED 5-1-2001
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
JANE DOE WECHSELER SERVED ON 4-30-2001
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
5/8/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$1000.00 TRO
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/16/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(7)
NOTE:
DEPOSIT SECURITY FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Filing Date
5/3/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P24 SERVED 05-03-01
Filing Date
5/3/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/2/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/17/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE
Filing Date
5/2/2001
Description
TRO - Temporary Restraining Order
Docket Date
5/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/11/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P9 SERVED 04-27-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P11 SERVED 04-27-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P14 SERVED 04-27-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P15 SERVED 04-27-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P16 SERVED 04-27-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P21 SERVED 04-29-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/2/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P22 SERVED 04-29-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/3/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P23 SERVED 04-30-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 04-29-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P8 SERVED 04-30-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/4/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
P10 SERVED 04-28-01
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
4/26/2001
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
4/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
4/26/2001
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
4/26/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Filing Date
4/26/2001
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL RE EFFORTS TO PROVIDE NOTICE
Filing Date
4/26/2001
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3 SERVED 04-25-2001
Filing Date
4/20/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/24/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/20/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/3/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
STIPULATED - RE: SUBSTITUTION OF REAL PARTY IN INTEREST; PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION;; DISMISSAL OF EPI-ART PALETTE LLC AND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
4/18/2001
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
4/23/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/10/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/23/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
GRANTING PLAS MOTION TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER UNTIL 4-16-01
Filing Date
4/10/2001
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/23/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE AS TO DEFS RICHARD AND MELANIE SHEAR
Filing Date
4/5/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/10/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/26/2001
Description
TRO - Temporary Restraining Order
Docket Date
4/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/26/2001
Description
OSC - Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
4/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE
Filing Date
3/22/2001
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/26/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/3/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
Filing Date
3/16/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/28/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS; AS TO DEF RICHARD IRA SHEAR
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/15/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(6)
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/16/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P4 SERVED 3-11-01
Filing Date
3/14/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/13/2001
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/14/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P6 SERVED 3-12-01
Filing Date
3/13/2001
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
3/21/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
3/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL RE EFFORTS TO PROVIDE NOTICE
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER
Filing Date
3/9/2001
Description
PSC - Petition For Order To Show Cause
Docket Date
3/13/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/16/2001
Time
15:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
4/16/2001
Time
11:00
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/7/2001
Time
11:15
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
5/17/2001
Time
8:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
7/9/2001
Time
13:30
Event
Order To Show Cause
Date
3/5/2002
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
3/19/2002
Time
0:00
Event
Default Hearing
Date
6/24/2002
Time
10:00
Event
Default Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/8/2002
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Artifacts
A: Richard Ira Shear
A: Richard Ira Shear
Amount
$46,226.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Default Judgment
Status
Date
7/8/2002
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Artifacts
A: Richard Ira Shear
A: Richard Ira Shear
Amount
$591,236.22
Frequency
One Time
Type
Default Judgment
Status