« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV1997-011786
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
6/25/1997
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michele T Pozgay
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Merrick Firestone
Party Name
William Robert Barrett
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
William Fairbourn
Party Name
Jon R Hulburd
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kenneth Miller
Party Name
Carrie Hulburd
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kenneth Miller
Party Name
Timothy Louis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kenneth Miller
Party Name
Amy Louis
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kenneth Miller
Party Name
Erin Gogolak
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
HARRY CAVANAGH
Party Name
Ginger Moore
Relationship
Endorsement Side 2
Sex
Female
Attorney
Jonathan Schneider
Party Name
Carol Propstra
Relationship
Endorsement Side 2
Sex
Female
Attorney
E Smith
Party Name
Ginger Moore
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Carol Propstra
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/17/2012
Description
DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet
Docket Date
12/19/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2012
Description
LED - 2.8 (d) Letter
Docket Date
10/5/2012
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/2/2004
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
9/21/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/26/2004
Description
ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond
Docket Date
9/17/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/24/2004
Description
MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond
Docket Date
8/26/2004
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2002
Description
NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit
Docket Date
12/11/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00 DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Filing Date
9/11/2002
Description
ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2002
Description
MAN - Order Of Mandate
Docket Date
9/24/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2002
Description
ATR - Appeals Transmittal Receipt
Docket Date
3/7/2002
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2002
Description
CAO - Court Of Appeals Order
Docket Date
1/22/2002
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO TRANSMIT ORIGINAL RECORD ON APPEAL WITHIN 15 DAYS
Filing Date
10/19/2001
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
11/20/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/12/2001
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
10/30/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFTER CONSOLIDATION SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
9/27/2001
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
10/17/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2001
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
9/22/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/13/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/16/2001
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(9)
NOTE:
OF PAYMENT OF APPELLEE PROPSTRAS FILING FEE
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement
Docket Date
8/8/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
8/9/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500.00; APPEAL BOND; PLA
Filing Date
8/7/2001
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
8/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/6/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/13/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE APPELLANTS FILING FEE
Filing Date
7/31/2001
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
7/31/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/31/2001
Description
CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt
Docket Date
8/7/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/30/2001
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
8/7/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: FILING FEES
Filing Date
7/27/2001
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/7/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
DENYING MOTIONS FOR RECONSIDERATION
Filing Date
7/19/2001
Description
AIX - Appeals Index
Docket Date
8/1/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFTER CONSOLIDATION
Filing Date
6/29/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF LODGING OF FORM OF ORDER
Filing Date
6/6/2001
Description
NAP - Notice Of Appeal
Docket Date
6/7/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/6/2001
Description
BON - Bond
Docket Date
6/7/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BOND FOR COSTS ON APPEAL
Filing Date
6/6/2001
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
6/7/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/6/2001
Description
NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court
Docket Date
6/20/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
$500 NOTICE OF APPEAL
Filing Date
5/24/2001
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
5/24/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2001 9:30:00 AM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/22/2001 9:30:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
5/14/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
6/5/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN/DEF GOGOLAKS TO FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/10/2001
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/9/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/24/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEF GOGOLAKS/ TO FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/8/2001 9:00:00 AM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/8/2001 9:00:00 AM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/18/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/7/2001
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
5/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO ENTER FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/4/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW OR STRIKE PRIOR FORMS OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/4/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/18/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO VACATE ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
5/10/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
5/1/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/24/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE PRIOR FORM OF JUDGMENT;NOTICE OF LODGING OF FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/25/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF LODGING OF FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/20/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/9/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO SUSPEND JUDGMENT ON PENDING MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NOTICE OF INTENT; TO SETTLE
Filing Date
3/27/2001
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
4/9/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEF PROPSTRA ---- JOINDER IN DEF MOORES - ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
3/27/2001
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/9/2001
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEF PROPSTRA ------ SUPPLEMENTAL SEPARATE - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
3/23/2001
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/27/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2001
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/29/2001
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
3/19/2001
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/29/2001
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
SEPARATE - TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
2/15/2001
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/26/2001
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(9)
NOTE:
OF AMOUNT OF TIME NECESSARY FOR TRIAL
Filing Date
2/7/2001
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
2/12/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/31/2001
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
2/5/2001
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/17/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/31/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
1/12/2001
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
1/27/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF ERIN GOGOLAKS RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL-RECONSIDERATION PURSUANT; TO RULE 59 ARCP
Filing Date
1/3/2001
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/26/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
12/19/2000
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/21/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/19/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/27/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL FOR PLA
Filing Date
12/15/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/3/2001
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL CITATIONS FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
12/14/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/3/2001
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 59 ARCP
Filing Date
12/13/2000
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
12/28/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EX PARTE - FOR WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/30/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/4/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (ALLOWING THE FIRM OF JONES, SKELTON & HOCHULI; PLC TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL OF DEFS TIMOTHY LUIS AND AMY LOUIS)
Filing Date
11/29/2000
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
12/8/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
11/28/2000
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/4/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/22/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/5/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
11/15/2000
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
11/17/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2000 3:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
11/14/2000 3:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
11/13/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/21/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO ALLOW WITHDRAWAL OF CO-COUNSEL JONES, SKELTON & HOCHULI PLC
Filing Date
11/13/2000
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
11/24/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/3/2000
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2000
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
10/31/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/2/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF BARRETTS PRELIMINARY RESPONSE TO PLAS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/NEW; TRIAL AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION
Filing Date
10/16/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/23/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/24/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/NEW TRIAL
Filing Date
10/10/2000
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
10/16/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO RULE 59 ARIZONA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE
Filing Date
10/10/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/16/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO AMEND OR ALTER JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/3/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
OF LODGING FORM OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/3/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/11/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/27/2000
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
10/4/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
9/26/2000
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
10/3/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2000
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS AGAINST WILL BARRETT
Filing Date
9/22/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/5/2000
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(9)
NOTE:
OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY
Filing Date
9/1/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/13/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF LODGING JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/22/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2000
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/25/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2000
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/15/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/1/2000
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/3/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF HIS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
7/20/2000
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/26/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEF BARRETT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
7/20/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/26/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE IV(f)/ IN OPPOSITION TO DEF BARRETT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON; ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
6/23/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/27/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
6/19/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SEPARATE/ IN SUPPORT OF HIS CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
6/15/2000
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
6/20/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
CROSS/ ON ALL CLAIMS
Filing Date
6/8/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/12/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/25/2000
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
6/10/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PARTIAL RE LIABILITY OF DEF BARRETT FOR SLANDER
Filing Date
5/25/2000
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
6/10/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
UNDISPUTED IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE LIABILITY OF DEF; BARRETT FOR SLANDER
Filing Date
5/10/2000
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/12/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/18/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AMENDED/ FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
4/27/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/8/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE
Filing Date
4/14/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/18/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/31/2000
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/6/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/2/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/7/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2000
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
3/2/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/17/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION AND OR REQUEST FOR RULING ON PLAS MOTION FOR NON-PARTY; DEPOSITION OF VIRGINIA BEARDSLEY
Filing Date
2/4/2000
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
2/14/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE: STATUTE OF LIMITATION
Filing Date
2/4/2000
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/15/2000
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT ON MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE: STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Filing Date
1/13/2000
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
1/21/2000
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
/ RE-URGING
Filing Date
1/5/2000
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/5/2000
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/29/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/1999
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
12/7/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF LOUIS RESPONSE TO PLAS MOTION TO STRIKE EXH A TO LOUIS DEFS MOTION FOR RULE; 54 (B) CERTIFICATION; LETTER DATED 6-8-99 TO KENNETH C MILLER FROM JON R POZGAY
Filing Date
11/10/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/20/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
11/8/1999
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/17/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEF MOORE'S SUPPLEMENTAL - IN SUPPORT OF HER REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER MOTION FOR; SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/8/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/17/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLA'S PROVISIONAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEF MOORE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR NON-PARTY DEPOSITION OF VIRGINIA BEARDSLEY
Filing Date
10/28/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF MOORE'S RESPONSE TO PLA RULE 56(f) MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTINUANCE,; OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR ADDITIONAL TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO MOORE MOTION; FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/27/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/1/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
STRIKING P7 PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
10/27/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1999
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
11/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/1999
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/28/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROVISIONAL RULE IV(F)/ IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOORE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/26/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/28/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MOORE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/21/1999
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
11/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/22/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/19/1999
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
10/25/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
10/19/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/25/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
TO PLAS RULE 56(F) MOTION AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTINUANCE OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR; ADDITIONAL TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO MOORE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/18/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/25/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(9)
NOTE:
TO COURT TO CORRECT COUNSEL'S ADDRESS
Filing Date
10/7/1999
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/12/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/4/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 56(F) - AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTINUANCE ALTERNATIVELY FOR ADDITIONAL TIME; WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO MORRE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/28/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/29/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JUDGMENT UNSIGNED
Filing Date
9/27/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/1/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
9/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/17/1999
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
9/23/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
LETTER DATED 6-18-99 TO JAMES J OSBORNE FROM JON R POZGAY
Filing Date
9/15/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/20/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLAS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO AMEND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUP-; PORT OF P7'S RULE 54(G) NOTICE OF INTENT TO CLAIM ATTORNEYS FEES TO INCLUDE INTHE CAPTION A MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON TAXABLE COSTS IF THE COURT DEEMS; THAT IS ESSENTIAL
Filing Date
9/13/1999
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
9/20/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
Filing Date
9/13/1999
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
9/20/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
Filing Date
9/10/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/16/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO AMEND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEF; GOGOLAK'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO CLAIM ATTORNEYS FEES TO INCLUDE IN THE CAPTION A; MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON-TAXABLE COSTS IF THE COURT DEEMS THAT IS; ESSENTIAL
Filing Date
9/2/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/8/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8-16-99
Filing Date
9/1/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO CORRECT MINUTE ENTRY DATED 8-16-99
Filing Date
9/1/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/7/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
Filing Date
8/30/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/1/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(9)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION TO COMPEL AND CROSS MOTION TO COMPEL PLA TO ANSWER INTROGATTORIES
Filing Date
8/25/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/30/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO COMPEL DEF PROPSTRA TO ANSWER INTERROGATORIES
Filing Date
8/18/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/24/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/23/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
FOR ORAL ARGUMENT ON P7'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON TAXABLE EXPENSES
Filing Date
8/16/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMBINED-TO MOTIONS FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/16/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE DEFS HULBURDS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT A AND FOR RULE 11; SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/16/1999
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION OF MOTION TO STRIKE DEFS HULBURDS RESPONSE TO; MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT A
Filing Date
8/13/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT "A"
Filing Date
8/13/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/18/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION TO STRIKE EXHIBIT A TO LOUIS DEFS MOTION FOR RULE 54(B); CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/11/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/19/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/12/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE EXHIBIT A TO DEFS HULBURDS MOTION FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION AND FOR; SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/10/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/12/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE EXHIBIT A TO LOUIS DEFS MOTION FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/10/1999
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
8/12/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR EXPEDITED DETERMINATION OF MOTIONS TO STRIKE
Filing Date
8/6/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/12/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION AND FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
8/3/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/9/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
FOR RULE 54(B) CERTIFICATION
Filing Date
8/3/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/9/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEF HULBURDS'/ TO SHELLEY NIXON'S COMBINED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO; HULBURDS' MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER - RELATED CASE CV99-01384
Filing Date
7/23/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/3/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMBINED - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER
Filing Date
7/20/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/28/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO SHELLY NIXON'S COMBINED RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO HULBURDS' MOTION TO; CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER - RELATED CASE CV99-03113
Filing Date
7/16/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/1999
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
6/9/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 4(g) URP/ OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
5/18/1999
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
5/27/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/15/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM BY NEW TIMES; INC AND AMY SILVERMAN
Filing Date
4/22/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/4/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
4/16/1999
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
5/10/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
RE: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEF MOORE
Filing Date
4/8/1999
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/19/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
3/31/1999
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/6/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NEW TIMES INC AND AMY SILVERMAN --- TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
3/31/1999
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
4/9/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
Filing Date
3/31/1999
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/28/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
TO PLAS AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT
Filing Date
3/30/1999
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
4/7/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/23/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
3/29/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/1999 5:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
3/17/1999 5:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
3/11/1999
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
3/16/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEF GOGOLAKS RULE 54(G) NOTICE OF; INTENT TO CLAIM ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON-TAXABLE EXPENSES
Filing Date
3/3/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
3/8/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
TO PLA RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
3/1/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
3/3/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
2/23/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/1999
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/25/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROVISIONAL/TO DEFENDANT MOORE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/18/1999 4:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/18/1999 4:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/16/1999
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/17/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
NOTE:
TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/16/1999
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
2/17/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
2/12/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/1999 3:00:00 PM
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
2/8/1999 3:00:00 PM
Filing Party
NOTE:
Posted during iCIS Conversion
Filing Date
2/5/1999
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
2/9/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
2/4/1999
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE DEFENDANTS MOORE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
2/1/1999
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/2/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
RULE 54(G)-OF INTENT TO CLAIM ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON-TAXABLE EXPENSES
Filing Date
1/27/1999
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
1/29/1999
Filing Party
Endorsement Side 2(8)
Filing Date
1/26/1999
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
1/28/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/25/1999
Description
JDI - Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/26/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
PLA POZGAYS COMPLAINT AGAINST P7 WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/23/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/27/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION
Filing Date
1/22/1999
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/26/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/13/1999
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
1/20/1999
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/11/1999
Description
053 - ME: Case Consolidation
Docket Date
1/14/1999
Filing Party
NOTE:
CV97-11786 CV98-04971 AND CV98-04973 CONSOLIDATED UNDER CV97-11786
Filing Date
1/8/1999
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/11/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
12/30/1998
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
1/4/1999
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
OF COSTS AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
12/23/1998
Description
049 - ME: Judgment Signed
Docket Date
12/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/22/1998
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/28/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO P5-6
Filing Date
12/21/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
12/10/1998
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
12/15/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/10/1998
Description
021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Docket Date
12/24/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/9/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
12/7/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/9/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS HULBURDS MOTION TO DISMISS (FALSE LIGHT INVASION; OF PRIVACY/INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS
Filing Date
12/3/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
12/3/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
12/9/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/4/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER
Filing Date
12/1/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/3/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER
Filing Date
12/1/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/4/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE OR TRANSFER
Filing Date
11/30/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
12/2/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE PA PROVISIONAL RULE IV(F) STATEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEF; GOGOLACKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/24/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA PROVISIONAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS; OR SPEAKING MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/24/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
12/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL-IN SUPPORT OF DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR; SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/24/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
12/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA PROVISIONAL RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS; OR SPEAKING MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/23/1998
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/24/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS DESIGNATION OF NONPARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
11/23/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS HULBURDS DESIGNATION OF NON PARTY AT FAULT
Filing Date
11/20/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DEF LOUIS JOINDER IN DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR; SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/20/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/24/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO PLA SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
11/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROVISONAL - IN OPPOSITION TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS OR SPEAKING MOTION; TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/20/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
11/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PROVISIONAL RULE IV (F) - IN OPPOSITION TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY; JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/19/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
DESIGNATION OF NON PARTY OF FAULT
Filing Date
11/18/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/20/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA'S 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
11/16/1998
Description
MCD - Motion To Consolidate
Docket Date
11/17/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
OR TRANSFER; RELATED CASE CV98-04973
Filing Date
11/16/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
11/17/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
Filing Date
11/16/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/17/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION
Filing Date
11/13/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OR ALTERNATIVELY FRO ADDITIONAL TIME W/IN WHICH TO RESPOND; AND REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT OF HEARING ON GOGOLAK'S MOTION TO DISMISS/MOTION; FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/13/1998
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
11/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF EXPEDITED DETERMINATION
Filing Date
11/12/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
11/16/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/10/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/12/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEFS SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE; FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
11/6/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF P3-4 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS STATUTE OF LIMITATION
Filing Date
11/6/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/6/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS' - IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/6/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF DEF LOUIS' MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
11/6/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
11/9/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEF GOGOLAK'S - OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/5/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/6/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE RESPONSE TO REPLY TO DEF GOGOLAK'S RESPONSE TO PLA'S RULE 56(F); MOTION REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEF GOGOLAK'S; MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/4/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA REPLY TO DEF GOGOLAKS RESPONSE TO PLA RULE 56(F) MOTION REQUESTING; ADDITIONAL TIME W/IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEF GOGOLAK'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/2/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/3/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF GOGOLAKS RESPONSE TO PLA RULE 56(F) MOTION REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME; WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS AND/OR MOTION FOR; SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
11/2/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/5/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/1998
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
11/5/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/28/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/2/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOT TO STRIKE AND RESPONSE TO PLA ALTERNATIVE MOT TO AMEND
Filing Date
10/28/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/5/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/27/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/28/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOT TO STRIKE ANS RES TO PLA ALTERNATIVE MOT TO AMEND THE; COM
Filing Date
10/26/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/27/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS AND GOGOLAKS SUPPLEMENTAL-TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL; SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
10/26/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/27/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEF HULBURDS SUPPLEMENTAL/ TO PL MOT FOR PARTIAL SUM JUDG RE; FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
10/26/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/27/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOT FOR PARTIAL SUM JUDG RE FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
10/26/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/28/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLA RULE 56 (F) MOT REQUESTING ADDITIONAL TIME WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO DEF; GOGOLAKS MOT TO DISMISS AND/OR MOT FOR SUM JUDG
Filing Date
10/23/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/26/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL-TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE FALSITY AND DEFENSE; OF TRUTH
Filing Date
10/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO THE HULBURN DEF MOT TO STRIKE AND ALTERNATIVE MOT TO AMEND COM
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/20/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OT EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION RE: COMBINED RES
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/20/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMBINED - IN OPPOSITION TO DEFS 12(B) (6) MOTION TO DISMISS AND DEFS 12(B)(6); MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/20/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEF HULBURDS RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS PLAS 2ND AMENDED; COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/19/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/20/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE 56(F) - AND AFFIDAVIT FOR CONTINUANCE OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR ADDITIONAL TIME; WITHIN WHICH TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
10/14/1998
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
10/16/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/13/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/15/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/6/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
12(B)(6)
Filing Date
10/6/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEF HULBURDS AND DEF GOGOLAKS MOTIONS TO DISMISS
Filing Date
10/6/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS MOTION TO STRIKE
Filing Date
10/2/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/2/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/8/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO STRIKE
Filing Date
9/29/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
12(B)(6)
Filing Date
9/29/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS-TO STRIKE COUNTS TWO AND THREE OF PLA SECOND AMENDED; COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/29/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/30/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS AND SPEAKING MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN
Filing Date
9/29/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
10/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
RULE IV(F)-IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/29/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
AND JOINDER IN DEF HULBURDS MOT TO DISMISS
Filing Date
9/28/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
10/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RULE 12(B)(6)-PLA SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/14/1998
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
9/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SECOND
Filing Date
9/11/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/21/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
COURT FINDS NO EVIDENCE OF CONTEMPT BY PARADISE VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB AS STATED; ON THE RECORD
Filing Date
9/9/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/11/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORD
Filing Date
9/2/1998
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
FOR CLARIFICATION OF 8-24-98 MINUTE ENTRY
Filing Date
8/25/1998
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/27/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/1998
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
8/21/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/1998
Description
EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet
Docket Date
8/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/1998
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
8/18/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Filing Date
8/10/1998
Description
NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure
Docket Date
8/13/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
INITIAL
Filing Date
8/7/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/12/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMBINED-TO DEFS RESPONSES TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: FALSITY; AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
8/4/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/8/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN - IN SUPPORT OF DEFS HULBURDS RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/29/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/5/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/27/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/30/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE; STATEMENT
Filing Date
7/22/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/24/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/24/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
TO PLA FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
7/22/1998
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
7/29/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
Filing Date
7/22/1998
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
7/29/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Filing Date
7/21/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
TO PLAS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/21/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/27/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
SEPARATE/ IN SUPPORT OF DEF GOGOLAK'S RESPONSE TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY; JUDGMENT RE FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO PLA'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
TO PLA'S RULE IV(F) STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY; JUDGMENT RE FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/20/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
SEPARATE - IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSE TO PLA'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY; JUDGMENT FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/20/1998
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RULE 56(F) - OF KENNETH C MILLER
Filing Date
7/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/23/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN DEFS HULBURDS-TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE FALSITY; AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/17/1998
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(5)
NOTE:
JOINDER IN - RULE 12(B)(6)
Filing Date
7/17/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/29/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/29/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
E
Filing Date
7/15/1998
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
BY P5-6 6/29/98
Filing Date
7/14/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/20/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
COMBINED-IN OPPOSITION TO DEF GOGOLAKS MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE; FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND TO THE HULBURD DEFS RULE 12(B)(6); MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/13/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
7/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/10/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
7/28/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/9/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/10/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(3)
NOTE:
RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
7/8/1998
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
8/18/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOCUMENT FILED SEZLED FOR LU CAUERZ INSPECTION
Filing Date
7/6/1998
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
7/9/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/1/1998
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
7/2/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P3-4 SERVED 6-19-98
Filing Date
7/1/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/7/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RULE IV(F)-IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: FALSITY AND; DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
7/1/1998
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/8/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PARTIAL-RE: FALSITY AND DEFENSE OF TRUTH
Filing Date
6/25/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/29/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(7)
NOTE:
MOTION TO DISMISS OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Filing Date
6/19/1998
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
6/24/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P7 SERVED 6-10-98
Filing Date
6/18/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/22/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS TO THE COURT FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION
Filing Date
6/17/1998
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
6/18/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
RE CONTEMPT
Filing Date
6/16/1998
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
6/19/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/16/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO PARADISE VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB'S RESPONSE TO PLA AMENDED MOTION COMPELLING PRO-; DUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND RESPONSE TO PARDISE VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB'S MOTION TO; QUASH SUBPOENA AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
6/8/1998
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/9/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE RESPONSIVE MEMORANDUM MAY BE FILED SEALED WITH THE CLERK OF THE COURT; & SHALL NOT BE UNSEALED WITHOUT A COURT ORDER
Filing Date
6/8/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/12/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PARADISE VALLEY COUNTRY CLUB- TO PLAS AMENDED MOTION COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF; DOCUMENTS AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Filing Date
6/5/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/10/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO EXTEND TIME PAGE LIMITATION AND MOTION TO FILE RESPONSE UNDER SEAL
Filing Date
6/4/1998
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/9/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
6/4/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/9/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO BARRETTS RESPONSE TO PLA REQUEST FOR COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL STATEMENT
Filing Date
5/29/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
6/3/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAS REQUEST FOR COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/28/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/10/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/1998
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
5/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/1998
Description
026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set
Docket Date
5/26/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/19/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/22/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF BARRETTS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAS; MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
5/18/1998
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
5/21/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
OF FILING AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF P2'S RESPONSE TO PLAS MOTION FOR PARTIAL; SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
5/15/1998
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
5/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
5/14/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL-FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OR ALTERNATIVELY FOR; ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF SECONDARY EVIDENCE
Filing Date
5/14/1998
Description
RQH - Request For Hearing
Docket Date
5/19/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
EXPEDITED ON AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OR,; ALTERNATIVELY, FOR ORDER REQUIRING PRODUCTION OF SECONDARY EVIDENCE
Filing Date
5/14/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/20/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/13/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/19/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
5/12/1998
Description
084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
5/15/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/1998
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
5/13/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
4/30/1998
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
5/1/1998
Filing Party
NOTE:
E
Filing Date
4/20/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
SEPARATE-IN SUPPORT OF HIS RESPONSE TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
4/20/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/22/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
4/15/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/20/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER
Filing Date
4/2/1998
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF'S RESPONSE TO PLA'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
4/2/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO P2'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER
Filing Date
4/1/1998
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/1998
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
4/3/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/30/1998
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
4/1/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
3/30/1998
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
4/1/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
PARTIAL - RE: SLANDER PER SE
Filing Date
3/30/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION TO CONTINUE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
3/30/1998
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/1/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
3/25/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/27/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO AMEND ANSWER
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS
Filing Date
3/24/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/25/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION
Filing Date
3/20/1998
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
3/19/1998
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/23/1998
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
2/25/1998
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/26/1998
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
Filing Date
12/22/1997
Description
012 - ME: Trial
Docket Date
1/6/1998
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/1997
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/2/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/1997
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/19/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR EXPENSES AND SANCTIONS
Filing Date
11/14/1997
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
11/20/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/1997
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
11/4/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
TO DEF RESPONSE TO PLA MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/30/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/4/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY AND FOR EXPENSES AND SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/30/1997
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
11/5/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
LOCAL RULE 3.2
Filing Date
10/21/1997
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/28/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO PLA MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/17/1997
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
10/20/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/1997
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/22/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/7/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/9/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR SANCTIONS
Filing Date
10/3/1997
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
10/14/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/23/1997
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/15/1997
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY
Filing Date
9/15/1997
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/17/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
SURREPLY TO DEF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Filing Date
9/2/1997
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/3/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY
Filing Date
8/21/1997
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/22/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISQUALIFY P1 COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/21/1997
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/25/1997
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/1997
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/20/1997
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
TO DISQUALIFY PLA'S COUNSEL
Filing Date
7/14/1997
Description
SAS - Summons & Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/18/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
NOTE:
P2 SERVED 7-10-97
Filing Date
6/25/1997
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/27/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
6/25/1997
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
6/27/1997
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/22/2001
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Michele T Pozgay
A: Ginger Moore
A: Ginger Moore
Amount
$0.00
Frequency
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
5/8/2001
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
Amount
$0.00
Frequency
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
11/14/2000
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Erin Gogolak
A: Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
Amount
$0.00
Frequency
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
3/17/1999
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Erin Gogolak
A: Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
Amount
$1,263.30
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
2/18/1999
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Jon R Hulburd
A: Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
Amount
$919.86
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status
Date
2/8/1999
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Timothy Louis
A: Michele T Pozgay
A: Michele T Pozgay
Amount
$1,371.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Judgment Only
Status